VA HB421 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Control of firearms by localities. Authorizes any locality by ordinance to prohibit the possession or carrying of firearms, ammunition, or components or any combination thereof in (i) any building, or part thereof, owned or used by such locality for governmental purposes; (ii) any public park owned or operated by the locality; (iii) any recreation or community center facility; or (iv) any public street, road, alley, sidewalk or public right-of-way or any other place of whatever nature that is open to the public and is being used by or is adjacent to a permitted event or an event that would otherwise require a permit. Provisions limiting the authority of localities and state governmental entities to bring lawsuits against certain firearms manufacturers and others are also repealed. The bill also provides that any firearm received by the locality pursuant to a gun buy-back program shall be destroyed by the locality unless the person surrendering such firearm requests in writing that such surrendered firearm be sold. The provisions of the bill do not apply to the activities of a Senior Reserve Officers’ Training Corps program operated at a public or private institution of higher education or (ii) any intercollegiate athletics program operated by a public or private institution of higher education and governed by the National Collegiate Athletic Association or any club sports team recognized by a public or private institution of higher education where the sport engaged in by such program or team involves the use of a firearm. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms, ammunition, etc.; control by localities by governing possession, etc., within locality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 45-N) (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Engrossment (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1205)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1205 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB421ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (48-Y 45-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 45-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-11HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB421ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-02-28HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N)
2020-02-28HouseSenate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 20108858D-S1 (54-Y 45-N)
2020-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB421S1
2020-02-26SenateAmendment B by Senator Norment agreed to
2020-02-26SenateReading of Floor amendment B waived
2020-02-26SenateAmendments A and A-1 by Senator Norment withdrawn
2020-02-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108858D-S1
2020-02-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108858D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2020-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-30HouseVOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N)
2020-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N)
2020-01-29HouseVOTE: Engrossment (53-Y 46-N)
2020-01-29HouseEngrossed by House (53-Y 46-N)
2020-01-29HousePending question ordered
2020-01-29HousePassed by temporarily
2020-01-29HouseRead second time
2020-01-28HouseRead first time
2020-01-24HouseReported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N)
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100939D

Same As/Similar To

SB35 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1247)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152915(n/a)See Bill Text
152915.1(n/a)See Bill Text
152915.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB421&201+sum+HB421
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB421+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB421S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB421ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB421ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1205+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0021+HB0421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0165+HB0421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0215+HB0421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0439+HB0421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0986HB0421+HB0421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1042HB0421+HB0421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1601+HB0421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2015HB0421+HB0421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2161+HB0421

Bill Comments

feedback