VA SB35 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Control of firearms by localities; permitted events. Authorizes any locality by ordinance to prohibit the possession or carrying of firearms, ammunition, or components or any combination thereof in (i) any building, or part thereof, owned or used by such locality for governmental purposes; (ii) any public park owned or operated by the locality; (iii) any recreation or community center facility; or (iv) any public street, road, alley, sidewalk or public right-of-way or any other place of whatever nature that is open to the public and is being used by or is adjacent to a permitted event or an event that would otherwise require a permit. Provisions limiting the authority of localities and state governmental entities to bring lawsuits against certain firearms manufacturers and others are also repealed. The bill also provides that any firearm received by the locality pursuant to a gun buy-back program shall be destroyed by the locality unless the person surrendering such firearm requests in writing that such surrendered firearm be sold. The provisions of the bill do not apply to the activities of a Senior Reserve Officers’ Training Corps program operated at a public or private institution of higher education or (ii) any intercollegiate athletics program operated by a public or private institution of higher education and governed by the National Collegiate Athletic Association or any club sports team recognized by a public or private institution of higher education where the sport engaged in by such program or team involves the use of a firearm. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms, ammunition, etc.; control by localities by governing possession, etc., within locality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 44-N) (Y: 48 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Ruling of Chair Sustained (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional readings dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1247)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1247 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB35ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 44-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 18-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB35ER)
2020-03-05SenateEnrolled
2020-02-28SenateHouse substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2020-02-28SenateReconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateTitle replaced 20108812D-H1
2020-02-28SenateHouse substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute with amendment (53-Y 46-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB35H1
2020-02-26HouseAmendment by Delegate Price agreed to
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108812D-H1
2020-02-26HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108812D-H1
2020-02-21HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-21HouseRead first time
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-01-16SenateRuling of Chair Sustained (21-Y 19-N)
2020-01-16SenateChair rules that bill does not violate the single object rule
2020-01-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB35S1
2020-01-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105646D-S1
2020-01-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-15SenateRead second time
2020-01-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105646D-S1
2020-01-13SenateIncorporates SB506 (Edwards)
2020-01-13SenateIncorporates SB505 (Edwards)
2020-01-13SenateIncorporates SB450 (Edwards)
2020-01-13SenateIncorporates SB615 (Deeds)
2020-01-13SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100476D

Same As/Similar To

SB450 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB505 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB506 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB615 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Judiciary
HB421 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1205)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152915(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB35&201+sum+SB35
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB35+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB35S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB35H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB35ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB35ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1247+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0008+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0035SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0048SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0049SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0105+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1471+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1225SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1258SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1259SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1961SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2268+SB0035

Bill Comments

feedback