VA HB409 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0280)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0280)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
The Virginia Retirement System; technical corrections. Makes technical corrections to programs administered by the Virginia Retirement System, some of which will become effective on January 1, 2017.
Title
The Virginia Retirement System; technical corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0280) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 280 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB409ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE(99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101756D |
Same As/Similar To
SB51 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)