VA HB409 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health; onsite sewage system design; report. Requires the Department of Health (Department) to convene a work group consisting of representatives from the Department; the Board for Waterworks and Wastewater Works Operators and Onsite Sewage System Professionals; the Board for Architects, Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, Certified Interior Designers and Landscape Architects; private sector engineering and design firms; and other interested stakeholders identified by the Department of Health to (i) identify and examine any engineering and design services related to the design of onsite septic systems currently offered by the Department to the public that are in inappropriate direct competition with private sector engineering and design firms, (ii) define the role of the Department in services related to onsite sewage system design to avoid inappropriate direct competition, (iii) develop a plan to wind up services offered by the Department deemed to be in inappropriate direct competition, and (iv) identify any necessary legislative or regulatory changes to implement the plan. The work group shall report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Board of Health by October 1, 2014.
Title
Health, Department of; onsite sewage system design, report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: # 3 |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101511D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB409 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB409+hil |