VA HB365 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local vehicle licenses; agreements with DMV. Provides that DMV will refuse registration or renewal of registration of a vehicle if any parking citation fees are owed to any county, city, or town, not just the county, city, or town that has entered into an agreement with DMV to deny registrations to persons who owe that particular locality the fee.
Title
Local vehicle licenses; agreements with DMV.
Sponsors
Del. Onzlee Ware [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125) | |
2010-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 125 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB365ER) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-01 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-28 | House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101727D |