VA HB365 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Substance abuse screening and assessment of public assistance applicants and recipients. Requires local departments of social services to conduct a screening of all applicants or recipients of public assistance. This bill provides that, where a screening indicates reasonable cause to believe an applicant or recipient is using illegal drugs, the applicant or recipient may be required to submit to drug testing. Where a drug test indicates that the applicant or recipient is using illegal drugs, the person shall become ineligible for public assistance. The person may reapply for public assistance once 12 months have elapsed from the date of initial ineligibility.
Title
Substance abuse screening; person become ineligible for public assistance if using illegal drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-01-29 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Committee substitute printed 088555460-H1 | |
2008-01-24 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-24 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083129460 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB365 |