VA HB361 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Relocation of certain billboard signs. Provides that a lawfully erected billboard sign may be relocated whenever such billboard sign is affected by the construction of a pedestrian bridge. The bill requires the Department of Transportation to place any permanent sign located in the highway right-of-way in such a location that it does not affect the visibility of a lawfully erected billboard sign. If such placement is not possible, such billboard may be relocated.
Title
Billboards; relocation of certain signs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Transportation |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103391D |