VA HB336 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Summary
Insurance market analyses; confidentiality. Establishes that (i) market analyses concerning insurance companies and obtained from the National Association of Insurance Commissioners, (ii) all market analyses generated by the State Corporation Commission, (iii) working papers, recorded information, and documents generated in the course of a market analysis or market conduct action, and (iv) documents or information received in the course of a market analysis or market conduct action from the NAIC, a law-enforcement official of any state or country, or regulatory officials of any state or country that are confidential in those jurisdictions shall receive confidential treatment by the Commission, shall not be subject to subpoena, and are not public records. The measure also requires the Commission to consider the results of market analyses in determining the nature, scope, and frequency of insurance company examinations. Finally, the measure provides that procedures for market conduct examinations shall be subject to provisions regarding confidentiality of ancillary information and immunity from liability.
Title
Insurance market analyses; confidentiality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 249 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB336ER) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-21 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-15 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080013400 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB336 |