VA HB311 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Open season for hunting bear. Provides that when the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries establishes an open season for the hunting of bear any legal hunting method, including the use of dogs, may be used for the entire season.
Title
Bears; Board of Game and Inland Fisheries establishes an open season for hunting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101055D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
Hunting Laws and Permits
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
Hunting Laws and Permits
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB311 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB311+hil |