VA HB307 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax subtraction; crime stopper rewards. Increases from $1,000 to $5,000, beginning in taxable year 2020, the maximum amount that may be subtracted from taxable income for amounts received as a reward for providing information to a law-enforcement official or agency, or to a nonprofit corporation created exclusively to assist such law-enforcement official or agency, that is used in the apprehension and conviction of perpetrators of crimes.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for crime stopper rewards.
Sponsors
Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Carrie Coyner [R] |
Del. Roxann Robinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 324 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB307ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 20101744D-E |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB307E |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101744D |
Same As/Similar To
SB931 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)