VA HB287 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expansion of gang-free zones. Adds school bus stops and publicly owned parks, libraries, and hospitals to the list of places denoted "gang-free zones." Criminal gang activity that occurs in gang-free zones receives additional punishment.
Title
Gang-free zones; expansion of zone areas.
Sponsors
Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Sal Iaquinto [R] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] |
Del. David Ramadan [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-06 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105025D-H1 | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102419D |