VA HB2804 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; professional Virginia Public Procurement Act; professional and information technology project services contracts; verification of work. Requires state agencies contracting for professional and information technology project services to include provisions in such contracts that require contractors to install software that allows for verification of the number of hours worked on a project using a computer. The bill requires such software to be procured by the contractor and provides that data collected belongs to the contractor; however, the contractor is required to provide access to such data to the contracting state agency under certain terms and for a period of seven years.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; professional and information technology project services contracts.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104663D |