VA HB2773 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; amount of award. Removes the current $600 limit placed on the amount that may be awarded to a crime victim for total loss of earnings resulting from incapacity. The bill also increases from $5,000 to $10,000 the maximum amount a claimant may be awarded from the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund for expenses directly related to funeral or burial costs and increases from $25,000 to $35,000 the maximum aggregate award received by a claimant as a result of an injury or death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; amount of award.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 524 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2773ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePrinted as engrossed 19102633D-E
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2773E
2019-01-30HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19102633D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192368.11:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2773
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2773+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2773E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2773ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0524+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0084+HB2773
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0082+HB2773
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2092+HB2773
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0294+HB2773
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0385+HB2773
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2773+HB2773
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2773+HB2773

Bill Comments

feedback