VA HB2766 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; conditions; triennial review. Directs the Commissioner of Health (i) to review charity care conditions on certificates of public need at least once every three years to determine whether conditions continue to be appropriate or should be revised and (ii) to notify the certificate holder as to his conclusions and the process for requesting changes to conditions on an existing certificate.
Title
Certificate of public need; conditions, triennial review.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839) | |
2019-04-03 | House | Enacted, Chapter 839 (effective 7/1/19) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2766ER2) |
2019-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2019-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2766ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19100615D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 102.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 102.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |