VA HB275 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; delay of termination of service for certain residential customers; serious medical condition; report. Requires the State Corporation Commission to conduct a proceeding to establish limitations on the authority of public utilities and cooperatives that provide electric, gas, water, or wastewater services to terminate service to any residential customer who provides certification that the customer has a serious medical condition or the customer resides with a family member with a serious medical condition. The bill directs the Commission to adopt regulations to implement such limitations after consulting with certain stakeholders. The bill requires the Commission to submit a report by November 1, 2026, and every three years thereafter, on the effectiveness of the serious medical condition policy after implementation of the regulations and include any suggested changes to such policy for residential utility and cooperative customers. Public utilities; delay of termination of service for certain residential customers; serious medical condition; report. Requires the State Corporation Commission to conduct a proceeding to establish limitations on the authority of public utilities and cooperatives that provide electric, gas, water, or wastewater services to terminate service to any residential customer who provides certification that the customer has a serious medical condition or the customer resides with a family member with a serious medical condition. The bill directs the Commission to adopt regulations to implement such limitations after consulting with certain stakeholders. The bill requires the Commission to submit a report by November 1, 2026, and every three years thereafter, on the effectiveness of the serious medical condition policy after implementation of the regulations and include any suggested changes to such policy for residential utility and cooperative customers.
Title
Public utilities; delay of termination of service for certain residential customers, report.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 637 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB275ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 24100938D-E |
2024-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB275E |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100938D |