VA HB2730 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; service disabled veteran business procurement enhancement program. Establishes a statewide service disabled veteran business procurement enhancement program. The bill establishes a statewide goal of five percent service disabled veteran business utilization in all discretionary spending by state agencies in procurement orders, prime contracts, and subcontracts.
Title
Va. Public Procurement Act; service disabled veteran businesses procurement enhancement program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19105046D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |