VA HB2696 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental Justice Advisory Council established. Establishes the Environmental Justice Advisory Council, consisting of 13 members, to advise the Governor on environmental justice in the Commonwealth through equitable development, implementation, evaluation, and enforcement of environmental laws, regulations, policies, and practices.
Title
Environmental Justice Advisory Council; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104073D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2699.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |