VA HB2679 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Jurisdiction of juvenile and domestic relations district courts; state or federal benefit. Grants the juvenile and domestic relations district courts jurisdiction to make specific findings of fact required by state or federal law to enable a child to apply for or receive a state or federal benefit. This bill is identical to SB 1758.
Title
Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; jurisdiction, specific findings of fact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 412 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2679ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference substitute printed 19107571D-H1 |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Surovell, Peake, Stanley |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Simon, Kilgore, Campbell, J.L. |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 19107092D-S1 (1-Y 98-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2679S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19107092D-S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107092D-S1 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103631D |