VA HB2667 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Highway Corporation Act of 1988; tolls; distance-based pricing program. Authorizes the operator of the Dulles Greenway to apply annually to the State Corporation Commission, during the period 2020 through 2029, for increases to tolls on the roadway to reflect increases in the Consumer Price Index plus one percent. The measure also requires the operator to complete by January 1, 2023, the construction and installation of improvements required to implement a distance-based pricing program for the roadway. Under the program, users will be charged tolls on the basis of the distance traveled. The operator is required to bear all expenses incurred in implementing the program. The Commission is directed to approve the program, provided that it satisfies conditions that, among other things, set tolls of $0.95 per mile at all times other than peak hours.
Title
Virginia Highway Corporation Act of 1988; tolls, distance-based pricing program.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105646D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19102580D |