VA HB2666 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (13-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Criminal Justice Services; training standards and model policies for law enforcement; persons experiencing behavioral health or substance abuse crises. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish training standards and publish and periodically update model policies for law-enforcement personnel for sensitivity to and awareness of persons experiencing behavioral health or substance abuse crises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement; DCJS to establish.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenatePassed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (13-Y 2-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HousePrinted as engrossed 19103690D-E
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2666E
2019-01-24HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 19103690D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback