VA HB266 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Interest on fines and costs in criminal cases and traffic infractions. Eliminates the accrual of interest on any fine or costs imposed in a criminal case or in a case involving a traffic infraction. The bill provides that any such fine or costs that have accrued interest prior to July 1, 2020, shall cease to accrue interest on July 1, 2020, and such accrued interest may be waived by any court. A person who owes fines and costs on which interest has accrued may move any court in which he owes fines and costs to waive the interest that accrued on such fines and costs and shall have such interest waived for any period of incarceration.
Title
Criminal cases and traffic infractions; eliminates accrual of interest on fines and costs.
Sponsors
Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100931D |