VA HB2631 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local alternative minimum wage. Establishes a procedure by which a local alternative minimum wage may be imposed in any locality. If imposed by ordinance of the local governing body, the alternative minimum wage requirement shall become effective on the July 1 that follows delivery of a certified copy of the ordinance to the Commissioner of Labor and Industry. A local alternative minimum wage requires every employer to pay to each of its employees, for work performed by them within the locality, wages at a rate to be determined by local ordinance. If the federal minimum wage exceeds the levels specified in a local alternative minimum wage requirement, the federal minimum wage will prevail.
Title
Minimum wage; local alternative.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 5-N) (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19100254D |