VA HB2629 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections Private Management Act; unauthorized private contracts; management or operation of prison facilities. Removes the authority of the Director of the Department of Corrections to enter into contracts with prison contractors for the operation of prison facilities, including management, custody of inmates, and provision of security. The bill does not affect the Director's authority to enter into contracts with prison contractors for other correctional services, including the following: (i) food services, commissary, medical services, transportation, or sanitation; (ii) development and implementation assistance for classification, management information systems, or other information systems or services; (iii) education, training, and employment programs; (iv) recreational, religious, and other activities; (v) counseling, special treatment programs, or other programs for special needs; or (vi) financing, site selection, acquisition, construction, maintenance, or leasing. The bill provides that the Department of Corrections shall have the Lawrenceville Correctional Center is in compliance with the provisions of the act by July 1, 2020.
Title
Corrections Private Management Act; unauthorized private contracts, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19102733D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 261 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 262 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 263 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 264 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 265 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 266 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |