VA HB259 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation-disadvantaged persons. Requires the Commonwealth to develop plans and programs to assist the transportation disadvantaged.
Title
Transportation-disadvantaged persons; requires State to develop plans to assist.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2010-02-04 | House: Continued to 2011 in Transportation by voice vote | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102389D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB259 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB259+hil |