VA HB259 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Summary
Students transferring out of a local school division. Requires a local school division to obtain written documentation of a student’s transfer before making any status classification in an information management system.
Title
Students; transferring out of a public school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422) | |
2008-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 422 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB259ER) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-28 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Printed as engrossed 088042504-E | |
2008-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB259E | |
2008-01-25 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-23 | House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2008-01-02 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088042504 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB259 |