VA HB2577 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-18)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; coverage for autism spectrum disorder. Requires health insurers, health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder in individuals of any age. Currently, such coverage is required to be provided for individuals from age two through age 10. The provision applies with respect to insurance policies, subscription contracts, and health care plans delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended on or after January 1, 2020. This bill is identical to SB 1693.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; coverage for autism spectrum disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 452 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2577ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102840D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823418.17(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2577
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2577+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2577ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0452+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0025+HB2577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0202V0007+HB2577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0081+HB2577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2502+HB2577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0148+HB2577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0347+HB2577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2577+HB2577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2577+HB2577

Bill Comments

feedback