VA HB2576 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sex Trafficking Response Coordinator; duties; report. Creates, within the Department of Criminal Justice Services, a Sex Trafficking Response Coordinator (the Coordinator) who shall (i) create a statewide plan for local and state agencies to identify and respond to victims of sex trafficking; (ii) coordinate the development of standards and guidelines for treatment programs for victims of sex trafficking; (iii) maintain a list of programs that provide treatment or specialized services to victims of sex trafficking and make such list available to law-enforcement agencies, attorneys for the Commonwealth, crime victim and witness assistance programs, the Department of Juvenile Justice, the Department of Social Services, the Department of Education, and school divisions; (iv) oversee the development of a curriculum to be completed by persons convicted of solicitation of prostitution; and (v) promote strategies for the awareness of sex trafficking, for education and training related to sex trafficking, and for the reduction of demand for commercial sex. The bill requires the Coordinator to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly and include a summary of activities for the year and any recommendations to address sex trafficking within the Commonwealth. The bill as introduced was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. This bill is identical to SB 1669.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex Trafficking Response Coordinator; establishes position, duties, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 486 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2576ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Vogel, Obenshain, Howell
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Krizek, Leftwich, Miyares
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-20HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-19SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-14SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-14SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104149D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91116.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2576
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2576+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2576ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0486+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0021+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0025+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0207V0010+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0077+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2395+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0249+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB2576+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2576+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2918+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0790HB2576+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1043HB2576+HB2576
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3295+HB2576

Bill Comments

feedback