VA HB2501 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Greenhouse gas emissions; inventory. Directs the Division of Energy of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy, as part of the 10-year Virginia Energy Plan required by current law, to inventory greenhouse gas emissions and provide information on (a) total emissions attributable to state government operations, (b) emissions by type of greenhouse gas according to the economic sector to which such emissions are attributable, and (c) the identity and output of each of the 10 largest sources of emissions of each type of greenhouse gas.
Title
Greenhouse gas emissions; inventory.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 7-N) (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104108D |