VA HB2497 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Bristol. Amends the charter for the City of Bristol. Changes to the charter (i) update provisions related to special meeting notices and notices related to removal by city council of certain appointees, (ii) clarify the description of the city manager and state that employees of the police department and fire department are among those employees that may be removed by the city manager, (iii) update the responsibilities of the city manager and chief of police regarding certain police department complaints, (iv) set forth financial policies to be adopted by the finance department, (v) specify certain personnel department oversight duties, (vi) rename the planning department as the community development department, (vii) create the position of environs control official, (viii) set out the duties of the transportation planner, (ix) alter the terms of the city planning commission, and (x) reference the existing BVU Authority Board. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Bristol, City of; amending charter, city powers, council meetings, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0633) | |
2019-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 633 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2497ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2497H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105337D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105337D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104003D |