VA HB249 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Setting aside judgments confessed. Provides that whenever a judgment confessed is set aside or modified pursuant to a motion by the judgment debtor, the subsequent case placed on the court's docket shall be considered a continuation of the original confession of judgment proceeding and shall maintain the same case number as the original proceeding, and no additional fee shall be charged for the docketing of the case.
Title
Judgment proceeding; setting aside judgment confessed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2013-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100212D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB249 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB249+hil |