VA HB2433 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Family caregiver tax credit. Creates a nonrefundable income tax credit beginning in taxable year 2019 for expenses incurred by an individual in caring for an eligible family member, defined in the bill, who requires assistance with one or more activities of daily living, also defined in the bill. The credit equals 50 percent of eligible expenditures incurred by the caregiver, but shall not exceed $1,000. In order to qualify for the credit, the family caregiver must (i) not receive any compensation or reimbursement for the eligible expenditures, (ii) have federal adjusted gross income that is no greater than $75,000 for an individual or $150,000 for married persons, and (iii) live in the same primary residence as the eligible family member for no fewer than 183 days during the taxable year.
Title
Family caregiver; tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102875D |