VA HB2418 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; banquet licenses for wineries and breweries. Increases from four to eight the number of banquet licenses a brewery or winery may obtain for events in any one-year period, provided that the event for which a banquet license is obtained is (i) at a place approved by the Board and (ii) conducted for the purposes of featuring and educating the consuming public about beer or wine products, respectively. The bill also specifically provides that such wine or beer manufacturer is limited to eight banquet licenses for such events per year without regard to the number of wineries or breweries, respectively, owned or operated by such manufacturer or by any parent, subsidiary, or company under common control with such manufacturer. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; banquet licenses for wineries and breweries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 159 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2418ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2418H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104703D-H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104703D-H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103734D |