VA HB2407 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Permanent foster care; eligibility. Allows local departments of social services and licensed child-placing agencies to place in permanent foster care, pursuant to a court order, a child who is 14 years of age or older but less than 16 years of age and who objected to the termination of residual parental rights, provided that no less restrictive alternative is available and the permanent foster care placement is in the best interest of the child. Under current law, a child must be 16 years of age or older in order to be placed in permanent foster care.
Title
Permanent foster care; eligibility.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101217D |