VA HB2404 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Requires 66 affirmative votes to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Requires 66 affirmative votes to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; Mathews County; Middlesex County. Adds Mathews County and Middlesex County to the list of counties that may impose a transient occupancy tax at a rate above two percent, but not to exceed five percent. The revenue attributable to a rate in excess of two percent shall be used solely for tourism and travel purposes. Current law allows all counties to impose a transient occupancy tax at a rate not to exceed two percent.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; adds various counties that may impose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (62-Y 31-N) (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (62-Y 35-N) (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (62-Y 35-N) (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Requires 66 affirmative votes to pass |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (62-Y 31-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (62-Y 31-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-25 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (62-Y 35-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (62-Y 35-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2404H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104797D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104797D-H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102251D |