VA HB240 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; annual applications for eligible absentee voters. Provides that any person who is eligible for an absentee ballot pursuant to law and who is likely to remain so eligible for the remainder of the calendar year shall be eligible to file a special annual application to receive ballots for all elections in which he is eligible to vote in that calendar year. This application requires a statement signed by the voter that he is eligible for an absentee ballot pursuant to law and is likely to remain so eligible for the remainder of the calendar year. Under current law, such a special annual application is available to persons who are eligible to vote absentee due to a disability or illness and are likely to remain eligible to vote absentee due to such disability or illness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; annual applications for eligible absentee voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101466D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242703.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback