VA HB24 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax exemption; menstrual supplies. Exempts menstrual supplies from sales and use tax.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for menstrual supplies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-11-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100984D |