VA HB2385 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Condominium Act and Property Owners' Association Act; delivery of condominium resale certificates and association disclosure packets; right of purchaser to cancel contract. Provides that a purchaser of a unit subject to the Condominium Act or a lot subject to the Property Owners' Association Act who receives a condominium resale certificate or association disclosure packet that is not in conformity with law may cancel the contract for such unit or lot (i) within three days after the date of the contract if the resale certificate or disclosure packet is received on or before the date that the purchaser signs the contract; (ii) within three days of receiving the resale certificate or disclosure packet if the resale certificate or disclosure packet is hand delivered, delivered by electronic means, or delivered by a commercial overnight delivery service or the United States Postal Service, and a receipt obtained; or (iii) within six days after the postmark date if the resale certificate or disclosure packet is sent to the purchaser by United States mail. This bill is identical to SB 1580.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominium Act and Property Owners' Association Act; delivery of condominium resale certificates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 364 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2385ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104170D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2385
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2385+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2385ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0364+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1102V0013+HB2385
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0067+HB2385
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1986+HB2385
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2032+HB2385
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0105+HB2385
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2385+HB2385
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2385+HB2385

Bill Comments

feedback