VA HB2381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Children's Ombudsman; Children's Advocacy Fund. Creates the Office of the Children's Ombudsman to provide ombudsman services, including investigation of complaints, advocacy, and information for children, parents, and citizens involved with child-serving agencies, as defined in the bill. The bill provides for the Office of the Governor to conduct a needs assessment with the Department of General Services to provide for the office space needs of the Office of the Children's Ombudsman. The bill also creates the Children's Advocacy Fund for the purpose of supporting the operations of the Office of the Children's Ombudsman. The Fund would be funded in part by fines collected from criminal offenses involving a child.
Title
Children's Ombudsman, Office of the, and Children's Advocacy Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103801D |