VA HB2377 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB2373-Peace) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB2373-Peace) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Medical malpractice; privileged communications of certain committees. Provides that factual information, whether written or oral, regarding specific patient care and treatment, including patient care incidents occurring within a health care facility, are not subject to the privilege granted to certain committees and entities. Currently, oral communications regarding a specific incident regarding patient care are privileged if made more than 24 hours after the incident. The bill also provides that the privilege enjoyed by such committees and entities applies only to communications originating with them and not communications provided to them. The bill also provides that reports of patient safety data in possession of a patient safety organization are discoverable if the reports are made available or required to be made available to health regulatory boards or other agencies by state or federal law. The bill further provides that the policies and procedures of such organizations and entities are not privileged and may be admissible in civil, criminal, or administrative hearings.
Title
Medical malpractice; privileged communications of certain committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB2373-Peace) by voice vote | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2373-Peace) by voice vote | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-13 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11102177D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2373 (Similar To) 2011-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2377 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2377+hil |