VA HB2376 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School meal policies. Requires each local school board to adopt policies that prohibit school board employees from requiring a student who cannot pay for a meal at school or who owes a school meal debt to throw away a meal after it has been served to him.
Title
School meal; adoption of policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100694D |