VA HB2365 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying a firearm or explosive material within Capitol Square or building owned or leased by the Commonwealth; exemptions; public institutions of higher education. Limits the exemption from the prohibition on the carrying of any firearm or explosive material within any building owned or leased by the Commonwealth or agency thereof or any office where employees of the Commonwealth or any agency thereof are regularly present for the purpose of performing their official duties that currently applies to any property owned or operated by a public institution of higher education to instead apply to any individual within a building owned or operated by a public institution of higher education who possesses a weapon as part of such public institution of higher education's curriculum or activities or as part of any organization authorized by the public institution of higher education to conduct its programs or activities within such building.
Title
Firearm or explosive material; carrying within Capitol Square or building state-owned or leased.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2023-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104407D |
Subjects
Capitol Square
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Explosives
Firearms
Property Grounds and Buildings State-owned
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Explosives
Firearms
Property Grounds and Buildings State-owned