VA HB2356 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Major Headquarters Workforce Grant Fund. Creates the Major Headquarters Workforce Grant Fund. A qualified e-commerce company that makes a capital investment of at least $2 billion in a major headquarters facility in Arlington County and that creates at least 25,000 new full-time jobs with an average annual wage of $150,000 will be eligible for up to $550 million in grants from the Fund. A qualified company may also be eligible for an additional $200 million in grants for creating an additional 12,850 new full-time jobs. This bill is identical to SB 1255.
Title
Major Headquarters Workforce Grant Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 482 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2356ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 14-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Special Subcommittee on Amazon |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102501D |