VA HB2355 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Students receiving home instruction; participation in Advanced Placement and Preliminary SAT/National Merit Scholarship Qualifying Test examinations. Requires school boards to (i) make Advanced Placement (AP), Preliminary SAT/National Merit Scholarship Qualifying Test (PSAT/NMSQT), and PreACT examinations available to students receiving home instruction; (ii) adopt written policies that specify the date by which such students shall register to participate in such examinations; and (iii) notify such students and their parents of such registration deadline and the availability of financial assistance to low-income and needy students to take such examinations. This bill is identical to SB 1414.
Title
Students receiving home instruction; participation in AP and PSAT/NMSQT.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 302 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2355ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103344D |