VA HB2339 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Access to electronic textbooks and adequate connectivity. Prohibits school boards from making electronic textbooks available for use by students in their residence or residences unless the school board adopts a plan to ensure that by July 1, 2018, every student in the local school division will have access to (i) a personal computing device capable of supporting such textbooks and (ii) adequate connectivity, which the bill defines as bandwidth of at least 1 megabit per second per student. The bill permits a local school board to establish a pilot program for the use of electronic textbooks at any secondary school in the local school division provided that (a) each student at the secondary school has access to a personal computing device capable of supporting such textbooks, (b) each student at the secondary school has access to adequate connectivity, and (c) the secondary school is receiving federal funds pursuant to Title I of the federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 or no more than five percent of the students in the local school division or 300 children, whichever is greater, participate in the pilot program.
Title
Electronic textbooks; access by students in their residence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15100765D |