VA HB2325 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School board employees; discipline; written reprimand. Requires the Board of Education to include, in its regulations that prescribe the requirements for the licensure of teachers and other school personnel required to hold a license, procedures for the a written reprimand of such license holders. The bill permits the Board of Education to issue written reprimand to any such license holder who knowingly and willfully commits a certain enumerated act relating to secure mandatory tests administered to students. The only express disciplinary actions that are permissible under current law in such a scenario are suspension or revocation of such individual's license. The bill also permits a school board or division superintendent to issue a written reprimand to a teacher who breaches his employment contract after the school board or division superintendent declines to grant such teacher's request for release from such contract on the grounds of insufficient or unjustifiable cause. The only express disciplinary action that is permissible under current law in such a scenario is revocation of such teacher's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School board employees; discipline, private reprimand.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 587 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2325ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HousePrinted as engrossed 19101302D-E
2019-01-31HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2325E
2019-01-31HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseReported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101302D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221292.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221298.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221304(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2325
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2325+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2325E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2325ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0587+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0024+HB2325
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0062+HB2325
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2115+HB2325
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0255+HB2325
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2325+HB2325
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2325+HB2325

Bill Comments

feedback