VA HB2317 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Three-year moratorium on installation of synthetic turf that contains recycled crumb rubber from waste tires at schools and recreational parks. Places a three-year moratorium on the installation of synthetic turf that contains recycled crumb rubber from waste tires within the boundaries of a public or private elementary or secondary school, public or private preschool, or recreational park by any (i) public or private elementary or secondary school, (ii) public or private preschool, or (iii) local governing body. The bill also requires the Virginia Department of Health, in coordination with the Virginia Department of Conservation and Recreation and the Virginia Department of Education, to analyze the potential adverse health impacts of synthetic turf that contains recycled crumb rubber from waste tires and report its findings to the General Assembly.
Title
Schools and recreational parks; installation of synthetic turf.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103516D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2317 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2317+hil |