VA HB2316 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voluntary boundary agreement between Counties of Caroline and Essex; attachment of GIS map to petitions. Allows the Counties of Caroline and Essex, in adopting a voluntary boundary agreement, to attach to their petitions to the circuit court a Geographic Information System (GIS) map depicting the boundary change. Under current law, such use of a GIS map, rather than a metes and bounds description, is permitted only regarding the boundary agreements of certain named localities. This bill incorporates HB 2624.
Title
Voluntary boundary; agreement between Counties of Caroline and Essex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 705 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2316ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2316H1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105003D-H1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Incorporates HB2624 (Ransone) |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105003D-H1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101192D |