VA HB2315 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Transportation; at-risk infrastructure; report. Directs the Department of Transportation, in collaboration with the Commonwealth Center for Recurrent Flooding Resiliency, to identify public transportation infrastructure at risk of flooding or deterioration due to flooding and to develop a plan for managing such assets.
Title
Transportation, Department of; at-risk infrastructure, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102325D |