VA HB2306 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0851)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Long-Term Employment Support Services and Extended Employment Services. Directs the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to make referrals to any employment services organization that provides competitive or commensurate wages and is eligible to receive state-funded Long-Term Employment Support Services or Extended Employment Services. The bill also requires the Department to develop and implement a referral process for individuals who make an informed choice to pursue an employment outcome that is not considered a competitive integrated employment setting by the Department. The bill also establishes the Employment Service Organization Steering Committee as an advisory board in the executive branch of state government. The bill provides that the purpose of the Committee shall be to report to and advise the Commissioner for Aging and Rehabilitative Services on policy, funding, and the allocation of funds to employment services organizations for Long-Term Employment Support Services and Extended Employment Services. This bill is identical to SB 1485.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Long-Term Employment Support Services and Extended Employment Services; referrals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 49-N) (Y: 47 N: 49 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0851)
2019-04-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 851 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 49-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (47-Y 49-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2306ER)
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-14SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-14SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-07SenateRereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 19101103D-E
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2306E
2019-01-29HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101103D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515169.1(n/a)See Bill Text
515169.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2306
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2306+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2306E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2306ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0851+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1203V0014+HB2306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0039+HB2306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1982+HB2306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2028+HB2306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0180+HB2306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0313+HB2306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2306+HB2306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2306+HB2306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2910+HB2306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3388+HB2306

Bill Comments

feedback