VA HB2304 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Common interest communities; suspension of certain owner rights for rules violations. Gives common interest community boards the authority, even in cases where the declaration does not expressly grant the authority to the boards, to (i) suspend a unit owner's right to use facilities or services, including utility services, provided directly through the association for nonpayment of assessments that are more than 60 days past due, to the extent that access to the unit through the common elements is not precluded and provided that such suspension shall not endanger the health, safety, or property of any owner, tenant, or occupant and (ii) assess charges against any owner for any violation of the declaration or of the rules or regulations promulgated pursuant thereto for which such owner or his family members, tenants, guests, or other invitees are responsible. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Community boards; suspension of certain owner rights for rules violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2011-01-31 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102014D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2304 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2304+hil |